Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon de Beaumont

Deceased

Bishop of Saintes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1660¹BornMarignac-Usseau
1708¹48.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jan 171656.0SelectedBishop of Saintes, France
11 May 171858.3ConfirmedBishop of Saintes, France
3 Jul 171858.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saintes, France
10 Oct 174484.7DiedBishop of Saintes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Léon de Beaumont:
Bishop Léon de Beaumont (born 1660, died ) Bishop of Saintes

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 22 Aug 2015