Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis de La Barde

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹BornGâtinais
10 Jun 164141.4SelectedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
26 May 164242.4ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
6 Jul 164242.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
22 May 167575.3DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis de La Barde:
Bishop Denis de La Barde (died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc

  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 121
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015