Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Zonga Ondedei

Deceased

Bishop of Fréjus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
May 1608³BornPesaro
8 Jul 165850.1AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
20 Oct 165850.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
23 Jul 167466.2DiedBishop of Fréjus, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Zonga Ondedei:
Bishop Giuseppe Zonga Ondedei (died ) Bishop of Fréjus

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015