Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Di Pietro

Auxiliary Bishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1964 Born
25 Oct 199733.6Ordained PriestPriest of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
28 May 201854.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
28 May 201854.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
2 Jul 201854.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum

MicroData Summary for Cesare Di Pietro (VIAF: 162480482)
Bishop Cesare Di Pietro (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina
Ordained BishopCathedral, Messina, Archdiocese of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 May 2018
  • ob: CB, 29 May 2018
  • c2+: CB, 27 Jun 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,801
  • c1: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast