Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Orazio Soricelli

Archbishop of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1952 Born
4 Jan 197623.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Benevento, Italy
11 Sep 197624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Benevento, Italy
3 Jun 200047.9AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
30 Jun 200047.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
23 Sep 200048.2InstalledArchbishop of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Orazio Soricelli
Archbishop Orazio Soricelli (born ) Archbishop of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalvi San Nazzaro, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained DeaconSanta Maria della Verità, Church, Benevento, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained PriestSanta Maria Assunta, Chapel, Apice, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopMaria Santissima Assunta, Cathedral Basilica, Benevento, Archdiocese of Benevento

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,796
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast