Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Giovanni Rinaldi

Bishop Emeritus of Acerra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1937 Born
2 Jul 196124.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 199962.5AppointedBishop of Acerra, Italy
29 Jan 200062.7Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
18 Sep 201376.3RetiredBishop of Acerra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Giovanni Rinaldi
Bishop Salvatore Giovanni Rinaldi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Acerra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCimitile

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Acerra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,690
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018