Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José (Giuseppe) Macchi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1845BornPalestrina, Italy
11 Apr 186822.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 188034.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy
27 Feb 188034.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadara
14 Mar 188034.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadara
9 Apr 188943.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy
9 Apr 188943.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
12 Apr 188943.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
12 Apr 188943.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
12 Apr 188943.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Peru
19 Aug 189752.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
26 Oct 189752.4AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
14 Feb 190155.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
26 Aug 190257.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
8 Jan 190458.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
8 Jun 190661.0DiedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal

MicroData Summary for José (Giuseppe) Macchi:
Archbishop José (Giuseppe) Macchi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Portugal

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 92, and Page 279
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 550
  • ab/1889: LB, 20 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013