Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Dell’Omo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acqui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1901BornTorino
1 Nov 192423.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 194341.7AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
29 Jun 194341.8Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
1 Jul 197674.8RetiredBishop of Acqui, Italy
23 Oct 199594.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Dell’Omo:
Bishop Giuseppe Dell’Omo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Acqui

  • a priest for 71.0 years
  • a bishop for 52.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013