Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Rossi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Palmyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1887Born
15 Oct 191124.5Ordained PriestPriest
1959²71.7AppointedRegent of the Apostolic Penitentiary
1962²74.7ResignedRegent of the Apostolic Penitentiary
9 Mar 196375.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Palmyra
21 Apr 196376.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palmyra
2 Mar 198395.9DiedTitular Bishop of Palmyra

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Rossi
Bishop Giuseppe Rossi (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Palmyra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosciate, Italy

  • a priest for 71.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast