Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michelangelo (Pierre) Cardinal Celesia, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1814BornPalermo
15 Jan 183521.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Jul 183622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Mar 185036.2AppointedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
13 Mar 186046.2SelectedBishop of Patti, Italy
23 Mar 186046.2ConfirmedBishop of Patti, Italy
15 Apr 186046.3Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
27 Oct 187157.8AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
10 Nov 188470.8Elevated to Cardinal
13 Nov 188470.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
25 Nov 188773.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
14 Apr 190490.3DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo (Pierre) Celesia:
Michelangelo (Pierre) Cardinal Celesia O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a priest for 67.7 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
  • a cardinal for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 434, and Page 438
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 50, and Page 52
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Nov 1884

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 25 Oct 2014