Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Rossini

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1796Born
2 Feb 185558.9SelectedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
23 Mar 185559.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
25 Mar 185559.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
27 Mar 186771.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
4 Jan 189093.8DiedBishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Rossini
Archbishop Gaetano Rossini (born , died ) Bishop of Molfetta, Giovinazzo e Terlizzi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBari
Ordained BishopVallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 72, and Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,855, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast