Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simone Spilotros, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1806Born
13 Jun 182922.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
31 Aug 185952.6SelectedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
26 Sep 185952.7ConfirmedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
2 Oct 185952.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
31 Oct 187770.8DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Simone Spilotros
Bishop Simone Spilotros O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Tricarico

EventPlace
Birth PlacePutignano, Diocese of Conversano
Ordained BishopSte Marie in Transpontine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 564
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017