Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Giuseppe Anselmo Natoli

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1799Born
2 Mar 182222.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 185858.7AppointedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
21 Mar 185858.7Ordained BishopBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
22 Feb 186767.6AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
24 Feb 187575.6DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Giuseppe Anselmo Natoli
Archbishop Luigi Giuseppe Anselmo Natoli (born , died ) Archbishop of Messina

EventPlace
Birth PlacePatti, Diocese of Patti
Ordained BishopSan Paolo fuori le Mura, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 171, and Page 380
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,858, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast