Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Darci José Nicioli, C.SS.R.

Archbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1959 BornJacutinga
31 Jan 198222.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Jan 198525.7Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
8 Mar 198626.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Nov 201253.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil
14 Nov 201253.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ficus
3 Feb 201353.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ficus
9 Mar 201656.8AppointedArchbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
22 May 201657.0InstalledArchbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Darci José Nicioli
Archbishop Darci José Nicioli C.SS.R. (born ) Archbishop of Diamantina

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Diamantina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2012
  • ob: CB, 14 Nov 2012
  • c34: CB, 28 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,653
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Mar 2016
  • i: CB, 9 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Mar 2016