Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filbert Felician Mhasi

Bishop of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1970 Born
3 Jul 200130.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mahenge, Tanzania
8 Dec 201848.0AppointedBishop of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania
17 Feb 201948.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tunduru-Masasi, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Filbert Felician Mhasi
Bishop Filbert Felician Mhasi (born ) Bishop of Tunduru-Masasi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiro, Diocese of Mahenge
Ordained BishopSt. Francis Xavier, Church, Tunduru, Diocese of Tunduru-Masasi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tunduru-Masasi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 9 Feb 2019
  • c2: CB, 17 Feb 2019
  • c3: CB, 18 Feb 2019
  • c34: CB, 19 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 19 Feb 2019

Quantcast