Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Manoel de Castilho Brandão

Deceased

Bishop of Alagôas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1849Born
30 May 187424.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 189445.0AppointedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
18 Nov 189445.2Ordained BishopBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
22 Jun 190151.8AppointedBishop of Alagôas, Brazil
15 Mar 191060.5DiedBishop of Alagôas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Manoel de Castilho Brandão
Bishop Antônio Manoel de Castilho Brandão (born , died ) Bishop of Alagôas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMata Grande, Diocese of Alagôas
Ordained BishopCollege Pio Latino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 83, and Page 144
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017