Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Cardinal Tonti

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1844Born
21 Dec 186723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
11 Jul 189247.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
25 Jul 189247.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samos
10 Aug 189247.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Haiti
10 Aug 189247.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Dominican Republic
10 Aug 189247.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
24 Feb 189348.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
15 Jul 189348.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes
1 Oct 189449.8AppointedArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
21 Jul 190257.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
23 Aug 190257.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
4 Oct 190661.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
25 Oct 191065.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
6 Dec 191570.9Elevated to Cardinal
9 Dec 191571.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
13 Feb 191772.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious
11 Dec 191874.0DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious

MicroData Summary for Giulio Tonti (VIAF: 253782449)
Giulio Cardinal Tonti (born , died ) Prefect of Affairs of Religious

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopDame del Sacro Cuore a Villa Lante, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's Chapter tomb, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
  • a cardinal for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 100, and Page 467
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 496, and Page 501
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 46
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 79, and Page 80, and Page 140
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 216, and Page 222, and Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast