Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste François Louis Grimault, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dakar

Titular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1883BornLa Selle-Craonnaise, France
5 Nov 190522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
24 Jan 192743.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal
24 Jan 192743.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina
25 Mar 192744.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina
12 Dec 194663.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Dakar, Senegal
18 Jun 198097.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dakar, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Auguste François Louis Grimault:
Bishop Auguste François Louis Grimault C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dakar

  • a priest for 74.6 years
  • a bishop for 53.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013