Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barry Francis Collins

Deceased

Bishop of Wilcannia-Forbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1938BornWaitara
15 Jul 196122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
30 Mar 199455.3AppointedBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
3 Jun 199455.5Ordained BishopBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia
15 Nov 200062.0DiedBishop of Wilcannia-Forbes, Australia

MicroData Summary for Barry Francis Collins:
Bishop Barry Francis Collins (born , died ) Bishop of Wilcannia-Forbes

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,325
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015