Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Alexandre Coupperie, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Baghdad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1770BornLa Chapelle-Palluau, France
1810²39.7ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
2 May 182050.0AppointedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
10 Sep 182050.4Ordained BishopBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
26 Apr 183161.0DiedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Alexandre Coupperie
Bishop Pierre-Alexandre Coupperie S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Baghdad

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 May 2016