Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eligio Pietro Cosi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong)

Titular Bishop of Priene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1819BornPontassieve, Italy
1839¹19.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
24 Aug 184324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
5 Feb 186545.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong), China
5 Feb 186545.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Priene
5 Feb 186545.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Priene
27 Sep 187051.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong), China
12 Jan 188565.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong), China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eligio Pietro Cosi:
Bishop Eligio Pietro Cosi O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong)

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 470

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013