Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltasar Valdés y Noriega

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618¹Born
6 Jul 166547.5AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
12 Jul 166547.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
29 Dec 166749.9DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baltasar Valdés y Noriega
Bishop Baltasar Valdés y Noriega (born 1618, died ) Bishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOviedo, Spain

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 200, Number 1,255
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast