Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Ugolini

Deceased

Bishop of Grosseto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1628Born
13 Apr 166536.5AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
3 May 166536.5Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
Dec 1699³71.1DiedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Ugolini
Bishop Cesare Ugolini (born , died Dec 1699) Bishop of Grosseto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerrara, Diocese of Ferrara
Ordained BishopSant'Ignazio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceSiena, Archdiocese of Siena
Buried Place (Original)San Martino, Church, Siena, Archdiocese of Siena

  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 198
  • b/c2+: AT, 4 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017