Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Sacchetti

Deceased

Bishop of Troia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹BornS. Severi
1 Oct 163540.8AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
7 Oct 163540.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
13 Jan 164853.0AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
Jun 1662³67.4DiedBishop of Troia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Sacchetti:
Bishop Francesco Antonio Sacchetti Bishop of Troia

  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 346, and Page 314
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 96, Number 578

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013