Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Tirotta

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1627¹Born
13 Apr 166538.2AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
3 May 166538.3Ordained BishopBishop of Squillace, Italy
17 Jan 167649.0DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Tirotta
Bishop Francesco Tirotta (born 1627, died ) Bishop of Squillace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuardavalle, Diocese of Squillace
Ordained BishopSant'Ignazio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceGuardavalle, Diocese of Squillace
Buried Place (Original)Guardavalle, Diocese of Squillace

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 321
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,849
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 7
  • b/c2+: AT, 4 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017