Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Morozzo Della Rocca

Deceased

Bishop of Novara

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1758BornTurin
14 Mar 180244.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 180244.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
4 Apr 180244.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
11 May 180244.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
2 Dec 180749.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
8 Mar 181658.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
8 Mar 181658.0Elevated to Cardinal
8 Aug 181759.4SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Novara, Italy
1 Oct 181759.6ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Novara, Italy
22 Mar 184284.0DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Morozzo Della Rocca:
Cardinal Giuseppe Morozzo Della Rocca (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
  • a cardinal for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 287, and Page 365

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013