Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Etienne Aconcius Köver, C.M.V. †

Deceased

Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

Titular Archbishop of Siunia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1740¹BornSzentgyörgy, Armenia
10 Jul 176323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia
28 May 180464.4AppointedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia
28 May 180464.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Siunia
3 Jun 180464.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Siunia
1825¹85.0DiedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Etienne Aconcius Köver
Archbishop Antoine Etienne Aconcius Köver C.M.V. (born 1740, died 1825) Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 12
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 348

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jun 2016