Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Rogadei, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1742Born
30 Apr 176118.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Dec 176422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Sep 176522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Jun 180562.6AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
30 Jun 180562.6Ordained BishopBishop of Caserta, Italy
15 Mar 181673.4DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Rogadei
Bishop Vincenzo Rogadei O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBisceglia

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1805, Number 18
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast