Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florido Pierleoni, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Acquapendente, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1742Born
20 Sep 176624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
20 Sep 180260.6AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
26 Sep 180260.6Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
29 Dec 182987.9DiedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy

MicroData Summary for Florido Pierleoni
Bishop Florido Pierleoni C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Acquapendente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittà di Castello

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 62
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast