Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustave Marie Blanche, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec

Titular Bishop of Sicca Veneria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1849BornJosselin, France
16 Mar 187828.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
21 Aug 190354.3AppointedPrefect of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada
15 Sep 190556.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada
15 Sep 190556.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sicca Veneria
28 Oct 190556.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sicca Veneria
26 Jul 191667.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gustave Marie Blanche:
Bishop Gustave Marie Blanche C.I.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013