Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henry O’Callaghan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Nicosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1827Born
15 Mar 185123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
1 Oct 188760.5AppointedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
18 Jan 188860.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
13 Mar 188860.9InstalledBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
19 Sep 188962.4ResignedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
1 Oct 188962.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
11 Oct 190477.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry O’Callaghan
Archbishop Henry O’Callaghan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Middlesex, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Edmund, College, Old Hall Green, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopSt. Thomas, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLittle Company of Mary, Hospital, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)San Miniato al Monte, Cemetery, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,286
  • b: CL, 22 Nov 2011
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 297, and Page 414
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 159
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 1
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast