Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Camillo Cardinal Siciliano di Rende

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1847Born
3 Jun 187123.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Dec 187730.5AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
1 Jan 187830.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
12 May 187931.9AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
25 Oct 188235.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
14 Mar 188739.7Elevated to Cardinal
14 Mar 188739.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
26 May 188739.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
3 Feb 188840.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lucera, Italy
1891¹43.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Lucera, Italy
16 May 189749.9DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Siciliano di Rende (VIAF: 89428050)
Camillo Cardinal Siciliano di Rende (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained PriestNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSS. Trinità ai Monti, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceAbbey, Montecassino, Territorial Abbey of Montecassino
Buried Place (Original)S. Clementina, Old Cemetery, Benevento, Archdiocese of Benevento

  • a priest for 25.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 147, and Page 565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Mar 1887
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 2
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 128
  • c34: CB, 14 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Jun 2018

Quantcast