Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Roman Sierakowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

Titular Bishop of Prusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1748BornTwierdza
28 Oct 177224.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Nov 177325.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 177830.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
28 Sep 177830.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Prusa
8 Dec 177830.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Prusa
27 Jul 180253.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Michal Roman Sierakowski:
Bishop Michal Roman Sierakowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 348, and Page 454
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,987
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016