Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Leon Łopaciński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

Titular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1751³BornSapiezgno Drugen
13 Mar 177423.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 177625.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
15 Apr 177625.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
30 Jun 177625.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
16 Jan 178634.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
23 Apr 180352.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Leon Łopaciński:
Bishop Józef Leon Łopaciński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 417, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,897
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015