Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Maciej Sierakowski

Deceased

Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1731³BornSlupno
14 Sep 175726.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Sep 175726.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 177846.9SelectedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
20 Jul 177847.3ConfirmedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
2 Feb 177947.8Ordained BishopBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
21 Mar 178150.0DiedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoni Maciej Sierakowski:
Bishop Antoni Maciej Sierakowski (born , died ) Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

  • a priest for 23.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 435
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,988
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015