Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Alojzy Aleksandrowicz

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1727³Born
6 Dec 175023.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Dec 175023.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 177547.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Chełm, Poland
17 Jul 177548.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Chełm, Poland
17 Jul 177548.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
15 Oct 177548.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
20 Mar 178052.7SucceededBishop of Chełm, Poland
11 Sep 178154.2DiedBishop of Chełm, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Alojzy Aleksandrowicz
Bishop Jan Alojzy Aleksandrowicz (born , died ) Bishop of Chełm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceByzozdowicz

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 162, and Page 192
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,894
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast