Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iwo Onufry Rogowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

Titular Bishop of Camachus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1737³BornBrwinowo
15 Mar 176628.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Poznań, Poland
26 Sep 178547.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
26 Sep 178547.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Camachus
26 Feb 178648.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camachus
23 Jan 180668.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Iwo Onufry Rogowski
Bishop Iwo Onufry Rogowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: CB, 22 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 6
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 142, and Page 454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016