Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Pałucki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1745³Born
19 Dec 179146.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
19 Dec 179146.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
29 Apr 179246.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michal Pałucki
Bishop Michal Pałucki (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDambnen

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 65, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,913
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast