Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Lee Gab-sou

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Busan {Pusan}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1924BornYan-Chen
28 Oct 195026.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 197147.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
25 Jul 197147.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Catabum Castra
24 Aug 197147.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catabum Castra
5 Jun 197551.2AppointedBishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
28 Aug 199975.4RetiredBishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
21 Dec 200480.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Lee Gab-sou:
Bishop Gabriel Lee Gab-sou (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Busan {Pusan}

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015