Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karel Marinus Choennie

Bishop of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1958 Born
30 Sep 198526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles
11 Nov 201556.8AppointedBishop of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles
24 Jan 201657.0Ordained BishopBishop of Paramaribo, Suriname, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Karel Marinus Choennie
Bishop Karel Marinus Choennie (born ) Bishop of Paramaribo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSuriname

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Paramaribo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2015
  • mn: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2015, Number 20
  • ob: CB, 24 Nov 2015
  • c2: CB, 13 Jan 2016
  • c34: CB, 24 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,800

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018