Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Everard Harris, C.S.Sp.

Archbishop Emeritus of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1942 Born
3 Nov 196725.6Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
14 Jul 196826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
8 Jul 201169.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
14 Sep 201169.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
26 Dec 201169.7SucceededArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
19 Oct 201775.5RetiredArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Joseph Everard Harris
Archbishop Joseph Everard Harris C.S.Sp. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Port of Spain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSurrey Village, Arouca
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Port of Spain, Archdiocese of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Port of Spain.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+/bp: CB, 14 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,141
  • s: Bollettino, 26 Dec 2011
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 17 Nov 2017