Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Migliorati, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Awasa, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Ambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1942Born
9 Sep 196826.0ProfessedMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
12 Apr 196926.6Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
21 Mar 200966.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Awasa, Ethiopia
21 Mar 200966.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ambia
31 May 200966.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ambia
12 May 201673.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Awasa, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Migliorati (VIAF: 173146937704213830105)
Bishop Giovanni Migliorati M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Awasa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePavone Mella, Italy

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,182
  • d: CB, 12 May 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast