Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hector Catry, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lahore

Titular Bishop of Semta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1889BornLedeghem-lez-Courtrai
6 Jun 191424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 Mar 192838.4AppointedBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
28 Oct 192839.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
4 Jul 194656.7ResignedBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
4 Jul 194656.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Semta
18 Mar 197282.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Lahore, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Hector Catry:
Bishop Hector Catry O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lahore

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1973
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013