Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy-Léandre Le Floch, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ajmer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1886BornPontrieux, France
13 Jun 193952.5AppointedBishop of Ajmer, India
24 Aug 193952.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ajmer, India
9 Aug 194659.7DiedBishop of Ajmer, India

MicroData Summary for Guy-Léandre Le Floch:
Bishop Guy-Léandre Le Floch O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Ajmer

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2+: LC
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013