Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Ghislain Delcuve, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}

Titular Bishop of Bargylia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1895BornMons, Belgium
28 Feb 192024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Jun 194852.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Jun 194852.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bargylia
10 Aug 194852.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bargylia
Jan 1958³62.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
13 Aug 196367.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Ghislain Delcuve:
Bishop Jean Ghislain Delcuve O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ubanghi Belga {Belgian Ubanghi}

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013