Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Villar y Sanz

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1872Born
4 Jun 189826.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 192654.7AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
19 Mar 192755.0Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
10 Jun 194371.2AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
13 Feb 194774.9DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Villar y Sanz
Bishop Juan Villar y Sanz (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSisamón

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast