Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Alves Correia da Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Leiria, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1872Born
5 Aug 189422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
15 May 192048.3AppointedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
25 Jul 192048.5Ordained BishopBishop of Leiria, Portugal
5 Aug 192048.5InstalledBishop of Leiria, Portugal
4 Dec 195785.8DiedBishop of Leiria, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Alves Correia da Silva
Bishop José Alves Correia da Silva (born , died ) Bishop of Leiria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Pedro de Fins

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast