Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Disma Marchese

Deceased

Bishop of Acqui, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1844Born
15 Apr 190156.3AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
23 Jun 190156.5Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
26 Nov 192580.9DiedBishop of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Disma Marchese
Bishop Disma Marchese (born , died ) Bishop of Acqui

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamogli

  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 114
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 62
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast