Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús Castillo Rentería, M.N.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tuxtepec, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1927BornMéxico
11 Jun 195022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros de la Natividad de María
8 Jan 197951.5AppointedBishop of Tuxtepec, Oaxaca, México
22 Apr 197951.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tuxtepec, Oaxaca, México
11 Feb 200577.6RetiredBishop of Tuxtepec, Oaxaca, México
23 Apr 201385.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Tuxtepec, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Castillo Rentería:
Bishop José de Jesús Castillo Rentería M.N.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tuxtepec

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 23 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013