Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Huejutla

Dioecesis Hueiutlensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 24 November 1922
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tulancingo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Hidalgo
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 6,014 (2,322 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centro
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Apartado 8, Ave. Corona del Rosal s/n, 43000 Huejutla, Hgo., México
  • Telephone: (789)896-0185
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
24 November 1922ErectedDiocese of Tulancingo Diocese of Huejutla (erected)
27 November 1960Territory LostDiocese of Huejutla
Diocese of San Luis Potosí
Diocese of Ciudad Valles (erected)
9 June 1962Territory LostDiocese of Huejutla
Diocese of Papantla
Diocese of Tulancingo
Diocese of Tampico
Diocese of Tuxpan (erected)
25 November 2006Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Huejutla (from Puebla de los Angeles, Puebla)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950332,500350,00095.0%151522,16626ap1951
1966270,000276,17397.8%602624,3543128ap1967
1970245,000250,00098.0%60604,0834621ap1971
1976309,180331,26493.3%524565,52146028ap1977
1980336,000362,00092.8%534575,89446028ap1981
1990435,000450,50096.6%918994,39388535ap1991
1999480,650510,97594.1%816875,52468338ap2000
2000481,430511,85094.1%759845,73198338ap2001
2001486,560512,78594.9%7510855,724106538ap2002
2002512,140515,99099.3%739826,24597638ap2004
2004494,205522,13594.7%848925,37186138ap2005
2006497,300524,18094.9%868945,29086038ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 19 Sep 2012